CHARITIES OF JOHN GREEN AND OTHERS

Charity number: 208113
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 24 September 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 27 September 2012: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 June 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREEN'S CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property