Linked charities CHARITIES OF JOHN GREEN AND OTHERS
Charity number: 208113

Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 24 MAY 1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF NAVESTOCK
Registration history
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 09 September 2009 : Removed
- 24 September 2009 : Standard registration
- 09 June 2012 : Removed
- 27 September 2012 : Re-registered
- 09 June 2013 : Removed
- 22 June 2013 : Re-registered
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.