BRITISH DENTAL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 208146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time Download