ASTON - MANSFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 208155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £537.43k £549.53k £454.96k £425.87k £580.12k
Total expenditure £618.30k £964.04k £724.30k £677.59k £908.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £499.52k £426.12k N/A N/A £275.89k
Income - Other £37.90k £123.41k N/A N/A £304.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £477.22k £682.34k N/A N/A £842.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £141.08k £281.70k N/A N/A £66.52k
Expenditure - Governance £7.46k £7.65k N/A N/A £8.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £398.30k £603.24k N/A N/A £829.07k
Expenditure - Investment management £141.08k £281.70k N/A N/A £66.52k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0