ASTON - MANSFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 208155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stuart McDonald Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Nina Susan Jane Gurney Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
MR CHRIS KEEN Chair
ASTON - MANSFIELD Received: On time
Rev PAUL EDWARD REGAN Trustee 09 September 2014
ASTON - MANSFIELD Received: On time
Rev Jeremy Fraser Trustee 14 January 2020
ASTON - MANSFIELD Received: On time
Alex Minford Trustee 25 September 2018
THE FOUNDATION FOR SOCIAL IMPROVEMENT Received: On time
Nigel James Grice Trustee 17 July 2018 None on record