Accounts and annual returns 'CITY OF LONDON POLICE WIDOWS' AND ORPHANS' FUND

Charity number: 208175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 February 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window