Accounts and annual returns OLD MASONIANS BENEVOLENT AND GRANT FUND

Charity number: 208177
Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 20 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 20 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window