Financial history OLD MASONIANS BENEVOLENT AND GRANT FUND

Charity number: 208177
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £23.83k £26.79k £70.94k £22.07k £26.03k
Total expenditure £6.97k £10.67k £11.65k £10.87k £13.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A