OLD MASONIANS BENEVOLENT AND GRANT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist members of the Old Masonians Association in reduced or distressed circumstrances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Wareham | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Simon Roderick Greaves | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW PETER FALL FOSTER | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
GEORGE JAMES HART TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
EDWIN GRAHAM MEEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SIR RICHARD EVANS CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.94k | £22.07k | £26.03k | £29.26k | £27.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £10.87k | £13.29k | £30.04k | £29.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH APRIL 1893 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 31ST JULY 1923. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN: A) RELIEVING NEED AMONG SUCH MEMBERS OF THE OLD MASONIANS ASSOCIATION WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS ARE RECOMMENDED BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE OLD MASONIANS ASSOCIATION TO THE TRUSTEES, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS; B) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSE SET OUT IN A), RELIEVING NEED AMONG FORMER PUPILS OF THE FORMER ROYAL MASONIC SCHOOL FOR BOYS AT BUSHEY, HERTFORDSHIRE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (THE “FORMER PUPILS”), BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS; C) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN A) AND B), RELIEVING NEED AMONG WIVES AND PARTNERS OF FORMER PUPILS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS; D) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN A), B) AND C), RELIEVING NEED AMONG FORMER BENEFICIARIES OF THE FORMER CHARITIES THE ROYAL MASONIC INSTITUTION FOR GIRLS (FORMER REGISTERED CHARITY NO. 311077) AND THE ROYAL MASONIC INSTITUTION FOR BOYS (FORMER REGISTERED CHARITY NO. 311058) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS; E) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN A), B), C) AND D), RELIEVING NEED AMONG MASONIC CHILDREN WHO WERE, ARE, OR ARE ELIGIBLE TO BE, BENEFICIARIES OF THE ROYAL MASONIC TRUST FOR GIRLS AND BOYS (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 285836) OR THE ROYAL MASONIC TRUST FOR GIRLS AND BOYS (REGISTERED CHARITY NO. 1170336 AND REGISTERED COMPANY NO. 01705033) (EACH “RMTGB)”) AND WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS; AND F) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE FOREGOING PURPOSES, RELIEVING NEED AMONG OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK APPROPRIATE (THE “OTHER CHARITIES”).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
201 GROVE LANE
LONDON
SE5 8BP
- Phone:
- 02077331409
- Email:
- ombgfund@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window