Trustees THE CONTEMPORARY ART SOCIETY
Charity number: 208178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Suss | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suling Mead | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ama Ofori-Darko | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Roden | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Francis Outred | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Franks | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Shield | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Anna Yang | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Blake | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Goltz | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|||||
THE LADY BEATRICE LUPTON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Valeria Napoleone | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRADLEY | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHY WILLS | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|||||
KEITH MORRIS OBE | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|||||
EDWIN WULFSOHN | Trustee |
|
||||||
TOMMASO CORVI-MORA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.