Governance THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS
Charity number: 208217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 21 July 2015: Funds received from 1043442 CATS ABUSED TREATMENT SOCIETY
- 02 July 2019: Funds received from 702610 THE LINCOLN SPIRITUAL ASSOCIATION
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- P D S A (Working name)
- PDSA PETAID SERVICES (Working name)
- PETAID (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.