Trustees THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS
Charity number: 208223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nigel Sheinwald | Chair | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Dorner | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Houmann | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Macaire | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Herbert Peter Swaniker | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Helen Cound | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhodri Huw Williams | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Nussbaum | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sam Alvis | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Scott Dryden | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anita Lowenstein Dent | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Payne | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Berriman | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.