Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MIDDLESEX NORTH WEST AND SOUTH HERTFORDSHIRE BRANCH
Charity number: 208331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Gardner | Chair | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Venessa Toofanny | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maisie Yau | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Winter | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Claire Carter | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Tyers | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Post | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Holton | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LOES BERNS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.