LILIAN BAYLIS TRUST (NINETTE DE VALOIS TRUST)

Charity number: 208371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required