ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX SOUTH WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 208381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 April 2017 On time Download