Financial history FUEL ALLOTMENTS CHARITY (HORSHAM AND NEWTON ST FAITHS)

Charity number: 208430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.10k £12.87k £58.24k £12.75k £11.94k
Total expenditure £55.68k £10.02k £57.61k £10.18k £12.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £352 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £902 N/A N/A N/A