Accounts and annual returns THE ST GILES CHRISTIAN MISSION

Charity number: 208434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window