Financial history THE ST GILES CHRISTIAN MISSION

Charity number: 208434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £110.91k £112.27k £120.84k £129.52k £112.84k
Total expenditure £152.14k £123.50k £162.28k £135.15k £126.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A