Trustees THE FELLOWSHIP OF ST NICHOLAS

Charity number: 208446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Ann Rogers Chair 09 August 2018
None on record
Hayley Thomas Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
John French Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Mary Osman Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Geoffrey Longmire Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
Dr Roger Elias Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
Richard Cuff Trustee 15 January 2018
None on record
Martin Harper Fr Trustee
TIMU RAFIKI
Received: On time
JANET MARY WYATT Trustee
None on record