Trustees CHAPEL MAINTENANCE FUND OF THE MOST DISTINGUISHED ORDER OF ST MICHAEL AND ST GEORGE

Charity number: 208482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RT REVD DAVID ANDREW URQUHART KCMG Chair
None on record
The Very Reverend Andrew Tremlett Trustee 02 September 2022
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE ORDER OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
Sir Mark Justin Lyall Grant GCMG Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Sir Philip Robert Barton KCMG OBE Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Baroness Catherine Ashton GCMG Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Lieutenant Colonel Stephen O'Neil Segrave Trustee 11 January 2019
THE ORDER OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
BATH CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
Dame DeAnne Julius Trustee 14 October 2015
JAPANESE GARDEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
SIR DAVID GEOFFREY MANNING GCMG CVO Trustee 23 August 2011
THE ATLANTIC EDUCATION PROJECT
Received: On time