PADWICK PARISH HALL FUND

Charity number: 208511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.48k £1.99k £2.09k £2.09k £2.48k
Total expenditure £0 £1.00k £2.03k £6.45k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A