ANGLO-ITALIAN SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS

Charity number: 208530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 April 2017 On time Download