ANGLO-ITALIAN SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS

Charity number: 208530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £362.55k £448.77k £254.65k £205.15k £337.66k
Total expenditure £529.90k £492.32k £420.16k £368.53k £299.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A