Accounts and annual returns JEWISH ASSOCIATION FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 208540
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required