Financial history JEWISH ASSOCIATION FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 208540
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.19k £5.69k £6.34k £4.18k £4.95k
Total expenditure £14.92k £16.40k £11.08k £11.44k £9.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A