THOMAS HEWAR

Charity number: 208553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £347 £2.54k £1.63k £1.61k £1.58k
Total expenditure £17 £256 £1.42k £442 £2.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A