Trustees THE LYGON ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 208562
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ross Gunderson | Chair | 18 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Councillor Ashok Patel | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liz Collins | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Alacoque Daly Khalil | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Penny Seabrook | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Ann Rosenberg | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BISHOP OF LONDON | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Amanda Lloyd-Harris | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WILLIAM NOEL | Trustee | 10 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL MORRIS | Trustee | 23 October 2000 |
|
|||||
VALERIE ANN ELISABETH BARKER | Trustee | 12 March 1988 |
|
|
||||
CLLR MRS ADRONIE ELIZABETH ALFORD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.