Financial history THE OXFORD HOUSE IN BETHNAL GREEN

Charity number: 208582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £832.90k £1.21m £1.10m £473.63k £532.48k
Total expenditure £408.14k £363.05k £505.99k £438.40k £452.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £275.17k £25.00k £100.76k £95.22k £173.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.48k £108 £6.27k N/A £195.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £29.54k N/A £36.37k
Income - Charitable activities £830.40k £216.76k £1.07m N/A £294.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other £15 £996.45k £718 N/A £5.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £275.08k £254.38k £464.60k N/A £416.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £41.40k N/A £35.75k
Expenditure - Governance £5.45k £5.40k £14.38k N/A £8.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £133.06k £108.68k £0 N/A £0