Trustees THE OXFORD HOUSE IN BETHNAL GREEN

Charity number: 208582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roxana Mitchell Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Dilruba Begum Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Lynda Alice Michelle Carnal Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Ibrar Alyas Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Robert William Robinson Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
James Andrews Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
Dr Polly Richards Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
Michael Judge Trustee 04 July 2012
None on record
LINDA KAUR Trustee
None on record