Accounts and annual returns STRATFORD AND EAST LONDON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 208659
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 April 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 March 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 02 March 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 02 March 2020 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required