SEVEN PILLARS OF WISDOM TRUST

Charity number: 208669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £41.26k £14.40k £13.63k £11.08k £12.63k
Total expenditure £18.76k £9.76k £10.18k £21.00k £17.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A