Trustees THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 208678
Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY BROWN Chair 16 July 2014
ARETE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH
Overdue by 268 days
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
Brian William Anderson Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Sheila Armstrong Trustee 09 February 2023
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
Ifeolu Omoniyi Akintunde Trustee 04 November 2021
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
ANNIE MAWSON'S SUNBEAMS MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Julia Chapman Trustee 31 January 2018
OPEN EARS
Received: On time
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
MARILYN BAKER Trustee
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time