Financial history CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SOCIETY OF ST ONGE AND ANGOUMOIS

Charity number: 208718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/04/2017 07/04/2018 07/04/2019 07/04/2020 07/04/2021
Total gross income £3.50k £3.59k £3.68k £3.81k £3.88k
Total expenditure £2.79k £909 £4.87k £3.26k £3.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A