Financial history WAR ON WANT

Charity number: 208724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.66m £1.61m £2.25m £1.73m £4.17m
Total expenditure £1.98m £1.72m £1.71m £1.70m £1.93m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.07m £982.97k £1.27m £1.01m £3.52m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £9.74k £7.07k
Income - Charitable activities £574.38k £610.06k £956.99k £701.49k £626.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.21k £11.34k £12.14k £10.46k £10.55k
Income - Other £6.32k £9.78k £13.70k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £186.58k £149.31k £446.74k £246.23k £2.35m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.27m £1.28m £1.32m £1.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £589.42k £447.80k £432.58k £383.63k £392.69k
Expenditure - Governance £32.94k £53.25k £40.27k £21.14k £14.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.19k £9.60k £8.82k £8.97k £10.10k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0