Financial history THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 208727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £130.52k £123.48k £122.04k £132.23k £128.00k
Total expenditure £56.01k £121.55k £131.62k £125.95k £129.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A