Trustees THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Charity number: 208727

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eur Ing Peter Simon Rickaby CEng | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Crabbe CMarSci | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sajid Hussain CEng | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Blacklock BEngH CEng | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynne Lewis BSc | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Darby BA FCA | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Brian McDearmid BSc CEng | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Keuning CEng | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Elisabeth Diane Wilson CEng | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MURPHY | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM PATERSON IEng | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CDR W K RIDLEY | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.