Financial history THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 208728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £85.61m £65.60m £70.68m £66.86m £58.82m
Total expenditure £85.43m £64.21m £74.67m £71.07m £58.13m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.87m £3.77m £5.82m £7.65m £6.45m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.33m £4.45m £4.80m £7.45m £11.60m
Income - Other trading activities £12.52m £11.05m £14.43m £12.38m £6.62m
Income - Charitable activities £66.55m £49.99m £49.79m £46.39m £37.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £206.00k £107.00k £263.00k £246.00k £144.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.40m £394.00k £2.51m
Income - Legacies £178.00k £286.00k £324.00k £1.43m £958.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £74.09m £52.77m £59.42m £55.20m £47.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.35m £11.44m £15.26m £15.87m £3.75m
Expenditure - Governance £165.00k £0 £99.00k £100.00k £77.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £520.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.45m