THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To achieve and promote the conservation of animals and their habitats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£83,329,000
Donations and legacies | £6.36m | |
Charitable activities | £56.03m | |
Other trading activities | £19.45m | |
Investments | £1.20m | |
Other | £299.00k |
Total expenditure:
£80,646,000
Raising funds | £1.70m | |
Charitable activities | £62.26m | |
Other | £16.69m |
£1,635,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,857,643 from 44 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £18.39m | |
Charitable expenditure | £62.26m | |
Retained for future use | £2.68m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £18.39m | |
Charitable expenditure | £62.26m | |
Retained for future use | £4.32m |
People

804 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
1106 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 26 |
£70k to £80k | 15 |
£80k to £90k | 9 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Angola
- Argentina
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Christmas Island
- Czech Republic
- Dominica
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- France
- French Polynesia
- Ghana
- Greece
- Greenland
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mauritius
- Mongolia
- Montserrat
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Niger
- Norway
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Portugal
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 April 1963: Standard registration
- INSTITUTE OF ZOOLOGY (Working name)
- LONDON ZOO (Working name)
- WHIPSNADE WILD ANIMAL PARK (Working name)
- ZSL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Karen Lawrence | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Cracknell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Loraine Woodhouse | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr May Chiao | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Athena Natassa Markides | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Kimblin KC | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Cuthbert Smith FRS | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David St John Jones | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shruti Ajitsaria | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES SYKES | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Alexander Richard Brooks Large | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.86m | £58.82m | £79.51m | £79.41m | £83.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.07m | £58.13m | £70.89m | £75.56m | £80.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.65m | £6.45m | £6.37m | £5.30m | £6.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.45m | £11.60m | £9.34m | £5.69m | £6.36m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.38m | £6.62m | £16.24m | £16.77m | £19.45m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £46.39m | £37.95m | £53.75m | £55.99m | £56.03m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £246.00k | £144.00k | £115.00k | £573.00k | £1.20m | |
|
Income - Other | £394.00k | £2.51m | £68.00k | £388.00k | £299.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.43m | £958.00k | £843.00k | £470.00k | £702.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £55.20m | £47.94m | £55.94m | £60.61m | £62.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £15.87m | £3.75m | £1.69m | £1.43m | £1.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £100.00k | £77.00k | £106.00k | £84.00k | £141.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £520.00k | £0 | £15.66m | £1.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £6.45m | £13.25m | £13.52m | £16.69m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £46.71m | £45.44m | £49.42m | £55.26m | £58.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.34m | £6.90m | £6.96m | £6.94m | £8.58m | |
|
Other assets | £22.93m | £28.17m | £38.29m | £33.17m | £33.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £4.46m | £1.92m | £10.27m | £5.98m | £7.96m | |
|
Total liabilities | £9.07m | £12.50m | £18.22m | £15.43m | £16.90m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 15TH JANUARY, 1963; ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON ACT 1928 ROYAL CHARTER DATED 15TH MAY 1995. And Royal Charter granted on 23 Jun 2021as amended by supplemental Charter 23 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ZOOLOGY BY, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, THE CONDUCTING OF SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, THE PROMOTING OF CONSERVATION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY AND THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS, THE CARE FOR AND BREEDING OF ENDANGERED AND OTHER SPECIES, THE FOSTERING OF PUBLIC INTEREST, THE IMPROVEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF ZOOLOGICAL KNOWLEDGE AND PARTICIPATION IN CONSERVATION WORLDWIDE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Linked charities
- 08 April 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Zoological Society of London
Regent's Park
London
NW1 4RY
- Phone:
- 03442251826
- Email:
- GeneralEnquiries@zsl.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window