Financial history THE NUCLEAR INDUSTRY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 208729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £67.86k £90.16k £81.64k £72.34k £76.37k
Total expenditure £159.89k £166.97k £174.54k £195.03k £212.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A