Trustees THE NUCLEAR INDUSTRY BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 208729

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH BEYNON | Chair | 01 April 2004 |
|
|||||
Michelle Louise Pearse | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Lambeth | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hodge Lane | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Frank Bowen | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kristofer Bradshaw | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Karen Lesley Walkden | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JAMES REILLY | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Frost | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH RUTH MANSFIELD | Trustee | 27 October 1997 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.