THE UNION JACK CLUB

Charity number: 208731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.86m £8.91m £8.47m £9.01m £9.09m
Total expenditure £7.23m £8.11m £8.08m £9.04m £8.57m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £208.61k £175.49k £137.28k £399.07k £7.27k
Income - Other trading activities £1.42m £1.54m £1.59m £1.40m £1.49m
Income - Charitable activities £6.06m £6.19m £6.53m £6.97m £7.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £98.97k £97.99k £111.36k £138.59k £125.54k
Income - Other £70.74k £909.94k £102.81k £99.57k £85.06k
Income - Legacies £28.85k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.25m £6.49m £6.97m £7.96m £7.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £936.91k £993.97k £960.40k £1.02m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.25k £21.43k £27.38k £34.49k £35.28k
Expenditure - Other £111.63k £681.05k £112.39k £115.19k £108.46k