THE UNION JACK CLUB

Charity number: 208731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Stopford CBE Trustee 16 December 2020 None on record
WILLIAM COWPE Trustee None on record
LIEUTENANT COMMANDER NICK ASHFORD FCA FS Trustee None on record
Glenn John Haughton OBE Trustee 12 March 2019 None on record
AIR COMMODORE MICHAEL BARNES Trustee
ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION NORTH COTSWOLD BRANCH Received: On time
DAVID EDWARD PETER ALBERT Trustee None on record
David Arthur Cooper MBA FCA Trustee 18 December 2013
THE HANOVER BAND FOUNDATION Received: On time
COLONEL JOHN JEREMY BROWN MBE Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
SUSANNE V SWAN Trustee None on record
CAPTAIN TIMOTHY MARTIN OBE Trustee 18 October 2011 None on record
RACHEL GARSIDE Trustee None on record
PETER E DAVIDSON Trustee None on record
JAMES EDWARD LINTER OBE Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
Vice Admiral Sir David George Steel KBE DL Chair 14 March 2017 None on record