Financial history NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 208734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.27m £5.69m £7.44m £6.45m £7.25m
Total expenditure £4.48m £4.71m £5.37m £5.64m £4.72m
Income from government contracts £0 £92.34k £127.13k £341.06k £60.38k
Income from government grants £1.48m £1.32m £1.35m £1.55m £1.50m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.02m £2.40m £3.72m £2.60m £4.38m
Income - Other trading activities £1.05m £1.14m £1.25m £1.49m £815.62k
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £1.84m £2.14m £1.79m £1.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.59k £85.13k £91.80k £98.27k £93.12k
Income - Other £208.28k £225.09k £241.12k £479.63k £175.67k
Income - Legacies £887.36k £819.35k £2.26m £626.96k £1.31m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.76m £2.94m £3.37m £3.35m £3.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.72m £1.77m £2.00m £2.29m £1.48m
Expenditure - Governance £11.34k £0 £12.85k £16.70k £19.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0