Financial history KETTERING TEMPERANCE SOCIETY

Charity number: 208856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.00k £20.09k £18.97k £19.14k £4.66k
Total expenditure £11.12k £15.58k £22.22k £24.68k £264
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A