Financial history SALMON LANE MISSION

Charity number: 208870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £15.58k £16.18k £11.26k £19.21k £29.04k
Total expenditure £73.99k £56.53k £34.36k £43.80k £53.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.53k £14.91k