Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MUSICIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 208879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marianne Olyver Trustee 14 February 2023
None on record
George Caird Trustee 18 December 2022
COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCHUBERT ENSEMBLE TRUST
Received: On time
George Vass Trustee 18 December 2022
THE MUSIC LIBRARIES TRUST
Received: On time
THE NOVA MUSIC TRUST
Received: 2 days late
Alistair Scahill Trustee 18 December 2022
None on record
Carl Anthony Jackson Trustee 19 December 2021
None on record
Jacoba Gale Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Clare Tyack Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Lawrence Wallington Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Kim Murphy Trustee 05 April 2020
None on record
JONATHAN RENNERT Trustee 15 December 2019
ORGANISTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR GEORGE THALBEN-BALL MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARABESQUE TRUST
Received: On time
Clare Amanda McCaldin Trustee 15 December 2019
None on record
MS Sally Groves MBE Trustee 16 December 2018
THE MUSIC LIBRARIES TRUST
Received: On time
LISTEN PONY LTD
Received: On time
UPROAR
Received: On time
THE MICHAEL TIPPETT MUSICAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
OPERA VENTURES
Received: On time
THE PETER MAXWELL DAVIES TRUST
Received: On time