Financial history THE ERIC ROBEY CHARITY

Charity number: 208889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.69k £3.72k £4.36k £2.78k £3.37k
Total expenditure £2.50k £4.90k £3.51k £4.20k £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A