Trustees WEST HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Charity number: 208941

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Daniel Niall WEIR | Chair |
|
||||||||
Councillor Frank Baffour | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Gilbert Smyth | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christian Adams | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Justin Charles Gau | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
POLLY MANN | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Joshua Cardale | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Fieber | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
BRIAN INNIS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
IRFAN SIDDIK MALIK | Trustee |
|
||||||||
EMMA PLOUVIEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KATHRYN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.