Trustees KING EDWARD VII'S HOSPITAL SISTER AGNES
Charity number: 208944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Richard Brook Sykes | Chair | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sanjay Shah | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Fiona Elizabeth Lawrence Driscoll | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Biddle | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Sinclair Kirby | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ELIZABETH TOOVEY PARKHOUSE | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIR STUART ANTHONY LIPTON | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rt Hon Professor Lord Ajay Kumar Kakkar | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.