CHARITY OF HENRY GOLDING DEEKS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT OF THE ELDERLY IN THE PARISH OF ACTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 April 2009: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2008 | 01/01/2009 | 01/01/2010 | 01/01/2011 | 01/01/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54 | £42 | £41 | £42 | £42 | |
|
Total expenditure | £74 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2012 | 26 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2011 | 26 March 2012 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED JULY 27TH 1910 - SEE U.V.158 P.118.
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH ORIN ANY WAY THE VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS MIGHT THINK DESIRABLE IN CONNECTION WITH THE SAID CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ACTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window